+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal #93
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/18/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal #0
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 539)
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 540)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 17)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §38 - 1 - 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 13, 2015: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 539)
March 13, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 540)
February 25, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 17)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor