+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/18/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal #0
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 472)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §30 - 40 - 20 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 472)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor