+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to table motion to discharge bill from committee adopted (Roll No. 400)
On February 29, 2016 in the House:
- To House Industry and Labor
- To Industry and Labor then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 202)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §61 - 11 - 26 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 32 - (Amended Code)