+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 262)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §30 - 5 - 12 b - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 29, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 262)
March 29, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor