+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 231)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §24 A- 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 28, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 231)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor