+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 240)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 241)
- Ordered to House
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 1st reading 2/28/16
- On 1st reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §31 B- 10 -1006 - (Amended Code)
- §47 - 9 - 53 a - (Amended Code)