+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 33, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/17/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/18/14 - Senate Journal #54
- To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal #36
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal #2797
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 9)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 286)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- To House Senior Citizen Issues
- To Senior Citizen Issues then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
- Ordered to House
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 2 - 29 b - (Amended Code)