+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - Senate Journal #19
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/16/16 - House Journal #0
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal #3
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/14/16
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 401)
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
- Read 3rd time
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
- To House Government Organization
- Do pass, but first to Government Organization
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Roads and Transportation
- To Roads and Transportation then Government Organization
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 70)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Natural Resources then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §17 F- 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §17 F- 1 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §17 F- 1 - 9 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 8, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 401)
February 9, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 70)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor