+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 101, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/10/16 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/10/16 - Senate Journal #28
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/10/16
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal #1220
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/9/16
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 366)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 367)
- Completed legislative action
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 32)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 32)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with title amendment
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 3 - 5 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 8 - 5 b - (Amended Code)