+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education
- Introduced in House
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 265)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 2 - 7 b - (Amended Code)