+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (50)
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- House Message received
- House Message received
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
- Communicated to House
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
- House appointed conferees: Cowles, Zatezalo, Byrd
- Communicated to Senate
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Trump, Ashley, Williams
- Communicated to House
- To conference
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report filed - House
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed - Senate
- Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 528)
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- Conference report received-House
- House rejected conference report
- Communicated to Senate
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- On 3rd reading with restricted right to amend, Special Calender
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 3rd time
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 514)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Amendments pending
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Judiciary
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Ordered to House
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 80)
On February 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §18 - 8 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 8 - 8 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 12, 2016: Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 528)
March 11, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 514)
February 11, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 80)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor