+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 178, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #56
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal #2802
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal #47
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Passed House (Roll No. 270)
- Read 3rd time
- Read 2nd time
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 269)
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Do pass
- Communicated to Senate
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §17 C- 1 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 15 - 26 - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 6 - 11 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2014: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 269)
March 5, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 270)
February 25, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor