+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/21/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/16 - Senate Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 491)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 306)
- House Message received
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 379)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 183)
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Ordered to House
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- To House Government Organization
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §30 - 18 - 10 - (Amended Code)