+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter 185, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/13/15 - House Journal #0
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/13/15
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/10/15 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/10/15
On March 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 372)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 371)
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 4)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 4)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §62 - 12 - 23 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 6, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 372)
March 6, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 371)
February 6, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 4)
February 6, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 4)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor