+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chapter 225, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/7/19 - House Journal #2102
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/7/19
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- To Governor 3/1/19 - House Journal #1290
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/1/19
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Passed House (Roll No. 220)
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 18, 2019 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 100)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §15 A- 1 - 7 - (New Code)