+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
- Motion
- On 3rd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (44)
- §11 - 15 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 1 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 - 23 a - (Repealed Code)
- §18 - 2 - 24 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 - 32 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 - 2 - 39 - (New Code)
- §18 - 2 E- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 E- 5 c - (Repealed Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 - 2 I- 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 - 3 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 3 - 9 b - (New Code)
- §18 - 3 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 - 18 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 - 44 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 - 45 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 A- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 2 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 2 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 - 1 d - (New Code)
- §18 A- 3 A- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 A- 2 a - (Repealed Code)
- §18 A- 3 A- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 A- 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 2 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 7 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 8 a - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 5 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 1 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 4 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 4 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 4 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 4 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 C- 4 A- 1 - (New Code)
- §18 C- 4 A- 2 - (New Code)
- §18 C- 4 A- 3 - (New Code)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor