+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/14/16
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal #4
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 351)
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 351)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 414)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 413)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- With title amendment, do pass
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 75)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 75)
- Ordered to House
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §11 - 21 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 21 - 71 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 351)
March 8, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 414)
March 8, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 413)
February 9, 2016: Effective from passage (Roll No. 75)
February 9, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 75)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor