+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal #3526
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/18/15
- Vetoed by Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal #128
On March 14, 2015 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 34)
- House Message received
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 466)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 438)
- Amendment reported by the Clerk
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 439)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 440)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 441)
- Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 442)
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Romano Floor amendment 1 rejected (Roll No. 4)
- Romano Floor amendment 2 rejected (Voice vote)
- Romano Floor amendment 3 rejected (Roll No. 5)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
- Ordered to House
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §20 - 2 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 14 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 6 a - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 - 6 - (Repealed Code)
- §61 - 7 - 3 - (Repealed Code)
- §61 - 7 - 7 a - (New Code)
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 466)
March 11, 2015: Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 442)
March 11, 2015: Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 441)
February 27, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
February 27, 2015: Romano Floor amendment 1 rejected (Roll No. 4)
February 27, 2015: Romano Floor amendment 3 rejected (Roll No. 5)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor