+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 164, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/20/18
On March 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - Senate Journal #462
On March 10, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/20/18 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/9/18 - House Journal #0
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/9/18
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 351)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 314)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2018 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
- To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 86)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, but first to Finance
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Natural Resources then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- §20 - 2 B- 7 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 314)
February 9, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 86)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor