+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 14, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/4/14 - Senate Journal #47
- To Governor 2/4/14 - Senate Journal #6
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 2/4/14 - House Journal #449
- Approved by Governor 2/4/14 - House Journal #453
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/4/14
- To Governor 2/4/14
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 24)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 25)
- Completed legislative action
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 3)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
- Read 3rd time
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 1/21/14
- On 3rd reading
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Votes (4)
January 29, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 25)
January 29, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 24)
January 22, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 3)
January 22, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor