+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 99)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed for introduction
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
+ − Statute Amended
- § 6 - 7 - 5 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 8, 2019: Passed Senate (Roll No. 99)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor