+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Motion to table motion to discharge bill from committee adopted (Roll No. 437)
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Energy
- To Energy then Finance
- Introduced in House
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Reported do pass
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Energy, Industry and Mining
- Introduced in Senate
- To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §11 - 28 - 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 3 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 2, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 262)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor