+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14
On March 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - House Journal #2840
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/28/14 - Senate Journal #56
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - House Journal #2802
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/27/14 - Senate Journal #47
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 4)
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 4)
- Completed legislative action
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 248)
- Passed House (Roll No. 247)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- To House Finance
- To Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 5)
- Ordered to House
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §11 - 21 - 74 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 15 - 16 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 5, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 4)
March 4, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 248)
March 4, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 247)
February 18, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 5)
February 18, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor