+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 131, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal #11
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 374)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 443)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 59)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Romano Floor amendment #1 rejected (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Romano Floor amendment #2 rejected (Roll No. 52)
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- §33 - 6 A- 1 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 18 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 5 - 19 - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 f - (New Code)
- §61 - 2 - 10 b - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 9, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 443)
February 5, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 59)
February 4, 2016: Romano Floor amendment #2 rejected (Roll No. 52)
March 12, 2011: Passed House (Roll No. 357)
March 9, 2010: Passed House (Roll No. 208)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor