+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- To House Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security
- To Veterans' Affairs and Homeland Security then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 95)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- 2nd reference dispensed
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (21)
- § 9 A- 1 - 11 b - (New Code)
- §11 - 12 - 86 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 23 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 24 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 25 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 - 26 - (Repealed Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 1 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 2 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 3 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 4 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 5 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 6 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 7 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 8 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 9 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 10 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 11 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 12 - (New Code)
- §29 - 3 E- 13 - (New Code)
- §61 - 3 E- 1 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 3 E- 11 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 15, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 95)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor