+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 129, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/14
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/25/14 - Senate Journal #55
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal #2801
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal #44
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 383)
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 384)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Palumbo Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Deferred until foot of 2nd reading
- Ordered to House
- Read 3rd time
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 24)
- Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 24)
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 2/24/14 with right to amend
- Deferred until foot of 1st reading
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
- Floor amendment reported
- Floor amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Statutes Amended (20)
- §61 - 7 B- 4 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 a - (Repealed Code)
- §61 - 7 B- 2 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 B- 1 - (New Code)
- § 7 - 1 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 7 B- 6 - (New Code)
- §61 - 7 B- 5 - (New Code)
- §61 - 7 B- 3 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 1 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 2 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 2 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 1 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- § 9 - 5 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 13 A- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 13 - 16 - (Amended Code)
- §16 - 13 - 23 a - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 20 - 10 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 8, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 384)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 383)
February 25, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 24)
February 25, 2014: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 24)
April 10, 2009: Passed House (Roll No. 345)
March 8, 2008: Passed House (Roll No. 463)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor