+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 22, 2016 in the House:
- To Political Subdivisions then Finance
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- To House Political Subdivisions
- Introduced in House
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 135)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (28)
- §31 - 15 A- 1 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 2 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 8 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 9 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 10 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 10 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 11 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 11 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 11 b - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 12 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 13 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 14 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 15 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 17 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 17 c - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 18 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 19 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 20 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 21 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 22 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 23 a - (New Code)
- §31 - 15 A- 24 a - (New Code)
- §59 - 1 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §59 - 1 - 2 a - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 15 C- 4 - (New Code)
- § 8 - 1 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 135)
March 14, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 573)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 2)
March 8, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 384)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 383)
February 25, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 24)
February 25, 2014: Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 24)
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor