+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 157, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal #18
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Passed House (Roll No. 580)
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate requests House to concur
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 405)
- House Message received
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 461)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Read 2nd time
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 5, 2016 in the House:
- To House Finance
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Finance
- Introduced in House
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 6)
- Ordered to House
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
On January 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §31 - 17 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- § 3 - 8 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §31 - 17 - 17 - (Amended Code)