+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- To House Government Organization
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- To House Technology and Infrastructure
- To Technology and Infrastructure then Government Organization
- Introduced in House
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 153)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §17 B- 2 B- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §17 B- 2 B- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §17 B- 2 B- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §17 B- 2 B- 7 - (Amended Code)