+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 5, 2016 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 378)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Government Organization
- To House Government Organization
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 217)
- Read 3rd time
On February 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 3rd reading 2/28/16
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Government Organization
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Natural Resources
- Introduced in Senate
- To Natural Resources then Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §20 - 2 - 35 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 42 z - (New Code)
- §20 - 2 B- 9 - (Amended Code)
- §20 - 2 - 42 o - (Amended Code)