+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- To House Energy
- To Energy then Finance
- Introduced in House
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 1/18/18
- On 2nd reading
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
- Originating in Senate Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §11 - 28 - 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 3 - (New Code)
+ − Vote
January 22, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 14)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor