+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 1)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- §17 C- 15 - 44 - (Amended Code)
- §17 B- 2 - 7 b - (Amended Code)
- §17 C- 1 - 69 - (New Code)
- §17 B- 1 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Vote
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 1)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor