+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
- To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 161)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Reported do pass, with amendments, but first to Finance
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Economic Development then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §11 - 28 - 1 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 2 - (New Code)
- §11 - 28 - 3 - (New Code)