+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/1817
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/17
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/18/17 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal #15
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 477)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
- Immediate consideration
- Read 1st time
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 165)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- §61 - 8 D- 1 a - (New Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 2 a - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 3 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 3 a - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 4 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 4 a - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 8 D- 5 - (Amended Code)
- §61 - 6 - 24 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (2)
April 7, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 477)
March 22, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 165)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor