+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 438)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 437)
- Read 3rd time
- Placed on Daily Calender
- On 3rd reading, House Calendar
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- From Daily Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On January 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 1)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 1)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §61 - 3 - 49 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 438)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 437)
January 20, 2014: Effective from passage (Roll No. 1)
January 20, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 1)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor