+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter 13, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal #92
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- To Governor 3/19/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/19/15 - Senate Journal #80
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 14)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 531)
- Read 3rd time
- Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 530)
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- To House Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development
- To Small Business, Entrepreneurship and Economic Development then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 8)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Economic Development
- Introduced in Senate
- To Economic Development then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- §11 - 16 - 6 a - (New Code)
- §11 - 16 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 6 b - (New Code)
- §11 - 16 - 3 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
March 13, 2015: Dispensed with Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 530)
March 13, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 531)
February 25, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 8)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor