+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - House Journal #0
- To Governor 3/24/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/24/16 - Senate Journal #16
- Vetoed by Governor 4/1/16 - Senate Journal #25
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Motion to reconsider and withdraw the amendment to the committee amendment adopted
- Amendment to committee amendment withdrawn
- Motion to reconsider and adopt committee amendment adopted
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 557)
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendment as amended and passed bill (Roll No. 506)
- House Message received
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
- House concurred in Senate title amendment
- Passed House (Roll No. 634)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate requests House to concur
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 3rd reading
- Read 3rd time
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 105)
- Ordered to House
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (9)
- § 5 - 3 - 6 - (New Code)
- §11 - 16 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 6 a - (New Code)
- §11 - 16 - 6 b - (New Code)
- §11 - 16 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §11 - 16 - 12 - (Amended Code)
- §60 - 3 - 24 a - (New Code)
- § 64 - 8 - 2 -