+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/11/16 - House Journal #0
On March 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/11/16
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 304)
- House Message received
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 361)
- Read 3rd time
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 34)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- §30 - 9 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 9 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 9 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §30 - 9 - 33 - (New Code)
- §30 - 9 - 34 - (New Code)
- §11 - 3 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 4, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 361)
February 2, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 34)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor