+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #20
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal #0
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal #12
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 507)
- Completed legislative action
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass, but first to Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- To House Banking and Insurance
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 58)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Banking and Insurance
- Introduced in Senate
- To Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- §19 - 25 - 7 - (Repealed Code)
- §64 - 10 - 4 - (Amended Code)