+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (39)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal #0
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/9/16 - Senate Journal #46
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/9/16
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- To Governor 3/9/16 - House Journal #1220
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/9/16
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On March 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 293)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 4, 2016 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed House (Roll No. 357)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
- Read 1st time
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary then Finance
- Introduced in House
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 27)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On January 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
On January 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On January 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- § 7 - 5 - 24 - (Amended Code)
- §11 A- 2 - 2 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 293)
March 4, 2016: Passed House (Roll No. 357)
February 1, 2016: Passed Senate (Roll No. 27)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor