+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter 96, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/2022
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/17/2022
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal #504
On March 12, 2022 in the House:
- To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal #0
On March 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal #466
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 565)
- House Message received
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 557)
- Title amendment adopted (Voice vote)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Amendment rejected (Voice vote)
- Amendment rejected (Roll No. 538)
- Committee amendment adopted (Roll No. 537)
- Amendment to committee amendment rejected (Roll No. 536)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education
- Introduced in House
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Baldwin amendment rejected (Roll No. 149)
- On 3rd reading with right to amend
- Trump amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 3rd time
- Romano floor amendment adopted (Roll No. 150)
- Karnes floor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 151)
- Ordered to House
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Education
- Introduced in Senate
- To Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (18)
+ − Statute Amended
- §18 - 8 - 1 - (New Code)