+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Removed from calendar by Rules Committee
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Laid over on 2nd reading 2/17/15
- On 2nd reading
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Finance
- Without recommendation, but first to Finance
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Transportation and Infrastructure
- Introduced in Senate
- To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- §11 - 15 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- § 7 - 1 - 3jj - (Amended Code)
- § 8 - 12 - 5 c - (Amended Code)
- §62 - 12 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §62 - 12 - 27 - (New Code)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor