+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chapter 58, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/20/14
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal #2839
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal #55
On March 14, 2014 in the House:
- To Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal #2800
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal #40
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 376)
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On March 8, 2014 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
On March 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 47)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Daily Calendar
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- To House Education
- To Education
- Introduced in House
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported do pass, with amendments
- Having been read 1st time 2/19/14
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading to Education
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Committee substitute reported, but first to Education
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- To Select Committee on Children and Poverty
- Introduced in Senate
- To Select Committee on Children and Poverty then Education
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- §18 - 21 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 21 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §18 - 5 - 15 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 2 b - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 4 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §18 A- 3 - 3 a - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (3)
March 8, 2014: Passed House (Roll No. 376)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (Roll No. 5)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor