+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 41, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #20
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar
- Placed on Special Calender
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 521)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to amend on 3rd reading rejected (Roll No. 520)
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Do pass
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 154)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute for committee substitute reported
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Finance
- Motion to refer to Finance adopted
- Motion to reconsider action adopted
- Motion to refer to Finance rejected
- Committee substitute reported
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §60 A- 4 - 414 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 8, 2017: Motion to amend on 3rd reading rejected (Roll No. 520)
April 8, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 521)
March 21, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 154)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor