+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 153)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 153)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- On 2nd reading
- Read 2nd time
- Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote)
On March 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- §46 A- 6 - 107 - (Amended Code)
- §46 A- 6 - 107 a - (New Code)
- §46 A- 6 - 107 b - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 21, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 153)
March 21, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 153)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor