+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 212, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal #26
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal #1631
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/6/17
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 319)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 296)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 35)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- §39 - 6 - 1 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 2 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 3 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 4 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 5 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 6 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 7 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 8 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 10 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 11 - (New Code)
- §39 - 6 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §39 - 6 - 9 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (3)
April 1, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 296)
February 28, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 35)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor