+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (54)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chapter 101, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal #27
On April 9, 2017 in the House:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal #0
On April 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal #19
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference report filed - Senate
- House Message received
- Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Boso, Gaunch, Facemire
- Communicated to House
- To conference
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference report filed - House
- House received Senate message
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 530)
- Senate requests House to concur
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- Conference report received-House
- House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 598)
- Communicated to Senate
- Completed legislative action
On April 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- House appointed conferees: Hanshaw, Zatezalo, Isner
- House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote)
- House received Senate message
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote)
- Communicated to House
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Roll No. 321)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 31, 2017 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced in House
- To Judiciary
- To House Judiciary
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 29)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- § 5 - 1 - 22 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (4)
April 3, 2017: Passed House (Roll No. 321)
February 27, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 29)
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor