+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chapter 162, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/2/15
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Governor 3/20/15
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal #0
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal #95
- To Governor 3/20/15 - Senate Journal #82
On March 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Completed legislative action
- Communicated to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 52)
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 52)
- House Message received
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Amended on 3rd reading
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
- Communicated to Senate
- Read 3rd time
- Passed House (Roll No. 459)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 460)
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- With amendment, do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 7)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 7)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- Immediate consideration
- Committee substitute reported
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary
On January 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Government Organization
- Introduced in Senate
- To Government Organization then Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statutes Amended (12)
- §64 - 9 - 1 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 3 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 7 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 10 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 9 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 2 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 4 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 6 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 11 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 5 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 8 - (Amended Code)
- §64 - 9 - 12 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
March 14, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 52)
March 12, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 460)
March 12, 2015: Passed House (Roll No. 459)
February 25, 2015: Effective from passage (Roll No. 7)
February 25, 2015: Passed Senate (Roll No. 7)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor