+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to House
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 124)
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 124)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Statute Amended
- §37 - 12 - 3 - (New Code)
+ − Votes (2)
March 16, 2017: Effective from passage (Roll No. 124)
March 16, 2017: Passed Senate (Roll No. 124)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor