+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chapter 144, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor 2/27/18 - House Journal #718
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor 2/27/18
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- To Governor 2/21/18 - House Journal #623
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Governor 2/21/18
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House received Senate message
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- House Message received
- Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 135)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 135)
- Communicated to House
- Completed legislative action
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 112)
- Passed House (Roll No. 111)
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading, Special Calendar
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Amendment adopted (Voice vote)
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading, Special Calendar
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading, Special Calendar
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Do pass
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- To House Judiciary
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in House
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 3rd time
- On 3rd reading
- Passed Senate (Roll No. 36)
- Effective from passage (Roll No. 36)
- Ordered to House
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 2nd time
- On 2nd reading
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read 1st time
- On 1st reading
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute reported
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- To Judiciary
- Introduced in Senate
- To Judiciary
- Filed for introduction
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
- §64 - 8 - 1 - (Amended Code)
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2018: Effective from passage (Roll No. 135)
February 16, 2018: Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 135)
February 15, 2018: Effective from passage (Roll No. 112)
February 15, 2018: Passed House (Roll No. 111)
January 31, 2018: Effective from passage (Roll No. 36)
January 31, 2018: Passed Senate (Roll No. 36)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor